DE HB377 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill permits a County government to impose and collect a lodging tax of no more than 3 percent on hotel, motel, and tourist home rooms located in the unincorporated areas of the County.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] |
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] | Rep. Melanie Smith [D] | Rep. John Viola [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-07 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-10 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-05-08 | Passed By House. Votes: 29 YES 8 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2018-05-08 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 377 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-05-08 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 377 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-19 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |