DE HB377 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill permits a County government to impose and collect a lodging tax of no more than 3 percent on hotel, motel, and tourist home rooms located in the unincorporated areas of the County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14 Signed by Governor
2018-06-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2018-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-05-10 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-05-08 Passed By House. Votes: 29 YES 8 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2018-05-08 Amendment HA 1 to HB 377 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-05-08 Amendment HA 1 to HB 377 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2018-04-19 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback