DE HB377 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act seeks to amend the current Charter of the Town of Dewey Beach in order to correct and/or delete antiquated language and typographical errors, render the Charter internally consistent, increase transparency of government, clarify legally problematic language, eliminate redundant and/or unnecessary language, and update the language to reflect current governmental realities.
Title
An Act To Amend The Laws Of Delaware Relating To The Charter Of The Town Of Dewey Beach.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2012-06-20 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-07 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |