DE HB374 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill adds glaucoma, chronic debilitating migraines, pediatric autism spectrum disorder, pediatric sensory processing disorder to the list of debilitating medical conditions which may qualify a person, upon certification by a physician, to be eligible for the use of medical marijuana in accordance with the terms of the Delaware Medical Marijuana Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Medical Marijuana Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-05-03 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2018-05-01 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-05-01 Amendment HA 1 to HB 374 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2018-04-25 Amendment HA 1 to HB 374 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-04-17 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback