DE HB373 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The Bill amends Title 4 to permit licensed Delaware craft distilleries, breweries, and wineries the ability to sell products produced by other Delaware craft distilleries, breweries, and wineries for on-site consumption, only. The products sold must be purchased through the existing three-tier system (i.e., wholesalers or traditional retailers).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Related To Alcoholic Liquors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07 Signed by Governor
2018-05-10 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-04-29 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2018-04-26 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
2018-04-17 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback