DE HB370 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill adds the Secretary of the Department of Human Resources and the Executive Director of Delaware CLASI or their designees to the Employment First Oversight Commission (hereinafter EFOC). The Bill also allows non-Delaware residents who work in Delaware for an employment agency that advocates or represents disabled individuals to participate on the EFOC. Finally, the Bill eliminates the prohibition on appointment of state employees to the EFOC under § 745 (1).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Employment Practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04 Signed by Governor
2018-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-07-01 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2018-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-26 Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate
2018-06-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2018-04-12 Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback