DE HB369 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill expands the offense of falsifying business records by including the act of altering or modifying and creating false medical records. Currently, no specific statute exists to prevent a person from falsely creating, altering, or modifying a medical record. Expanding the offense of falsifying business records to include medical records will be a useful tool for combating healthcare provider fraud, protecting patients, and assisting patients in ensuring the integrity of their medical records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Falsification Of Business Records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-04-29 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-04-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-04-26 Amendment HA 1 to HB 369 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-04-25 Amendment HA 1 to HB 369 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2018-04-12 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback