DE HB368 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is a result of the Joint Legislative Oversight and Sunset Committee's ("JLOSC") review of the Provider Advisory Board ("Board"). Based on its findings, JLOSC recommended sunsetting the Board, which is addressed in separate legislation. This Act fulfills JLOSC's related recommendation, to add a third center-based early care and education provider to the Delaware Early Childhood Council ("DECC").
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Early Childhood Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-11 | Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate | |
2024-06-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2024-04-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |