DE HB366 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Judicial & Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act revises the crime of "unlawfully permitting a child access to a firearm," an existing class A misdemeanor under Delaware law. The offense is renamed "unsafe storage of a firearm" to place emphasis on firearm safety and proper storage. Under the revised statute, a crime is committed when a person intentionally or recklessly stores or leaves a loaded firearm where a minor or other person prohibited by law, or unauthorized person, can access the firearm, and the unauthorized person obtains the firearm. The unauthorized persons use of the firearm to inflict serious physical injury or death is not an element of the offense, but is an aggravating factor. For the purposes of this offense, stores and leaves does not include when firearm is carried by or under the control of the owner or another lawfully-authorized user.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Safe Storage Of Firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-05-08 Passed By House. Votes: 21 YES 16 NO 4 ABSENT
2018-05-08 Amendment HA 2 to HB 366 - Defeated By House. Votes: 19 YES 20 NO 2 ABSENT
2018-05-08 Amendment HA 1 to HB 366 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
2018-04-12 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback