DE HB366 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Judicial & Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Judicial & Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act revises the crime of "unlawfully permitting a child access to a firearm," an existing class A misdemeanor under Delaware law. The offense is renamed "unsafe storage of a firearm" to place emphasis on firearm safety and proper storage. Under the revised statute, a crime is committed when a person intentionally or recklessly stores or leaves a loaded firearm where a minor or other person prohibited by law, or unauthorized person, can access the firearm, and the unauthorized person obtains the firearm. The unauthorized persons use of the firearm to inflict serious physical injury or death is not an element of the offense, but is an aggravating factor. For the purposes of this offense, stores and leaves does not include when firearm is carried by or under the control of the owner or another lawfully-authorized user.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Safe Storage Of Firearms.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Lynn [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Rep. David Bentz [D] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] |
Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-05-08 | Passed By House. Votes: 21 YES 16 NO 4 ABSENT | |
2018-05-08 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 366 - Defeated By House. Votes: 19 YES 20 NO 2 ABSENT | |
2018-05-08 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 366 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |