DE HB366 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-28 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 29 NO 0 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-28 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 29 NO 0 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill endeavors to reconcile patients’ rights to know all their health care options with the desire of some health care providers to not provide certain care based on religious or philosophical beliefs. This act balances the religious liberty of health care providers with the basic health care rights of their patients. This act requires that any health care provider who uses religious beliefs to determine patient care instead of standard medical guidelines and practices, subsequently resulting in any health care options being omitted or favored based on these religious beliefs, to inform patients in writing of health care services that are not available to the patients through this particular provider. Patients must provide signed consent acknowledging they have received this information. Additionally, this act requires health care providers who use religious beliefs to determine patient care to inform health insurance companies of specific health care options that are not provided; health insurance companies will share that information with their enrollees and insured participants. The bill also requires disclosure to state and federal agencies involved with health care administration, and a subsequent relay of that information by state agencies to affected clients.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To A Patient's Right To Know All Their Health Care Options.
Sponsors
Rep. John Kowalko [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. Joseph Miro [R] |
Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 29 NO 0 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-28 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-06-23 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-06-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2016-05-05 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |