DE HB363 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is a result of the Joint Legislative Oversight and Sunset Committee's ("JLOSC") review of Adult Protective Services ("APS"). In the process of the review, and with APS's agreement, JLOSC recommended eliminating the Adult Protective Services Advisory Council under ยง 3903 of Title 31 and absorbing that council's role into the Council on Services for Aging and Adults with Physical Disabilities. This Act makes the required changes to the Council on Services for Aging and Adults with Physical Disabilities. The APS Advisory Council is removed from Title 31 in separate legislation.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Council On Services For Aging And Adults With Physical Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-05-10 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-05-04 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2022-04-12 | Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate | |
2022-04-12 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-04-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-31 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |