DE HB362 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - HS 1 for HB 362 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - HS 1 for HB 362 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill regulates the location of residential gas regulators and gas meters.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 26 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Public Utilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 362 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-07-01 | House | HS 1 for HB 362 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2016-06-28 | House | HS 1 for HB 362 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-22 | House | HS 1 for HB 362 - Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-06-21 | House | HS 1 for HB 362 - Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) |
2016-06-21 | House | Substituted by HS 1 for HB 362 |
2016-05-05 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Energy Committee in House |