DE HB360 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

As poll from 2017 revealed that 31% of people in the United States have been sexually harassed in the workplace. The United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission released a comprehensive study of workplace harassment in the United States which concluded that between 25% and 85% of women reported having experienced sexual harassment in the workplace. However, the Commission estimated that 75% of all workplace harassment incidents go unreported. The purpose of this bill is to combat sexual harassment in the workplace and to ensure the safety and dignity of all employees in Delaware. This bill defines sexual harassment and makes employers responsible for the sexual harassment of an employee by a supervisor or by another employee when the employer knew or should have known about it and failed to take appropriate corrective action. Moreover, this bill prevents an employer from retaliating against an employee for filing a discrimination charge. This bill includes a requirement that the Department of Labor create an information sheet pertaining to sexual harassment that employers must distribute to employees. Employers having more than 50 or more employees in Delaware will be required to provide sexual harassment training to all employees and supervisory employees which must be conducted every 2 years. This bill also empowers the Department of Labor to investigate violations of this Act and gives the Department jurisdiction over all sexual harassment cases which includes an administrative process. This bill requires the Department of Labor to post the requirements in this bill on its website and perform outreach necessary to educate employers of the requirements. This bill takes effect on January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Employment Practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-29 Signed by Governor
2018-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 6 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT
2018-07-01 Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 14 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2018-07-01 Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-07-01 Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Stricken in House
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 11 On Its Merits
2018-06-12 Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 360, and Assigned to Labor Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback