DE HB356 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act allows the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control to lease historic structures on State public lands to individuals or corporate entities. The lessee would be required to renovate and maintain the structure up to the applicable National Park Service Secretary of Interior Standards, would be permitted to insure the property and are eligible for Land and Historic Resource Tax Credits. DNREC is required adopt any necessary rules and regulations to implement the Act and may require the lessee to abide by any other lease conditions or commitments, including specific expenditure requirements, which the DNREC deems advisable for the public good.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Conservation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-11 Signed by Governor
2018-06-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-05-10 Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate
2018-05-08 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 8 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2018-03-27 Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback