DE HB355 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act allows an agency, as defined in ยง 6902 of Title 29, (agency) to accept electronic bid submissions and on-line bidding for contracts procuring material and nonprofessional services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To State Procurement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-04-25 Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-04-24 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-04-24 Amendment HA 1 to HB 355 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-04-24 Amendment HA 1 to HB 355 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-27 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback