DE HB354 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act makes the Delaware equal accommodation law internally consistent, correctly organized, and aligned with the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA").

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Equal Accommodations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-09 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2018-06-07 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2018-03-27 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback