DE HB351 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

In December 2016, the federal Office of Child Support Enforcement issued final regulations titled "Flexibility, Efficiency, and Modernization in Child Support Enforcement Programs," 81 Fed. Reg. 93,492 (Dec. 20, 2016) (codified at 42 C.F.R Pt. 433). This Act updates to whom Delaware's Division of Child Support Services can send child support payments, in compliance with the federal regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Child Support.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-17 Signed by Governor
2018-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-27 Rules Suspended in Senate
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-05-03 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2018-05-01 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2018-03-22 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback