DE HB351 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
In December 2016, the federal Office of Child Support Enforcement issued final regulations titled "Flexibility, Efficiency, and Modernization in Child Support Enforcement Programs," 81 Fed. Reg. 93,492 (Dec. 20, 2016) (codified at 42 C.F.R Pt. 433). This Act updates to whom Delaware's Division of Child Support Services can send child support payments, in compliance with the federal regulations.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Child Support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-27 | Rules Suspended in Senate | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-03 | Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2018-05-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-04-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |