DE HB350 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 of this bill would require schools to seek the signature from each parent of a parent/school compact at the beginning of each school year, reflecting an updated Parents’ Declaration of Responsibilities to be prepared by the State and parent organizations. Existing law encourages, but does not require, that parents be asked to sign such a compact. Section 2 of this bill would significantly expand the parental involvement portion of schools’ Delaware Public Education Profiles, in order to inform the public about which schools are diligently pursuing parent/school compacts, and how schools that receive federal Title 1 funds are using those funds to enhance parental involvement.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Parental Involvement In Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Stricken | |
2010-04-22 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2010-04-21 | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2010-04-21 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |