DE HB35 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act charges the Department of Safety & Homeland Security, in cooperation with the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control and the Department of Transportation, to present a report and plan to the General Assembly no later than October 1, 2023 for a comprehensive motor vehicle noise and abatement program. The agencies are charged with considering developments in technology, other state and federal standards, and proposing changes as necessary to Delaware law and recommendations for changes in equipment and procedures.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Motor Vehicle Noise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-04-05 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-03-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2023-01-17 | Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2023-01-17 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2023-01-17 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 35 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2023-01-17 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 35 - Stricken in House | |
2023-01-17 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 35 - Stricken in House | |
2023-01-17 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 35 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2023-01-17 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 35 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2023-01-11 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-12-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |