DE HB35 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill changes the definition of the multi-purpose sports facility to make it available to a broader range of sports facilities that may apply for a liquor license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Alcoholic Liquors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28 Signed by Governor
2019-01-24 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2019-01-23 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 Favorable
2019-01-15 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2019-01-15 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2019-01-15 Amendment HA 1 to HB 35 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2019-01-09 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits
2019-01-09 Amendment HA 1 to HB 35 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-01-07 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback