DE HB35 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill sets forth a framework for the licensing, regulation and inspection of business establishments that provide massage and bodywork services. This bill places oversight of any business offering massage services in the hands of the Board of Massage and Bodywork. Specifically, it defines massage establishment, and grants authority to the Board of Massage and Bodywork to grant or deny licensure of such establishments and adopt regulations pertaining to the licensure, maintenance and standards to be applied to such establishments. It provides authority for the Division or Professional Regulation to inspect such establishments without any advance notice or concurrent criminal investigation. This bill imposes criminal and civil penalties, including injunctive relief, fines, and imprisonment, for the unlicensed practice of massage and bodywork and the operation of an unlicensed massage establishment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Massage And Bodywork.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-26 Signed by Governor
2017-06-22 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-06-15 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-15 Amendment SA 2 to HB 35 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-06-15 Amendment SA 2 to HB 35 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-10 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-04-28 Amendment SA 1 to HB 35 - Stricken in Senate
2017-04-05 Amendment SA 1 to HB 35 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-04 Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
2017-03-30 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-03-30 Amendment HA 1 to HB 35 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-03-30 Amendment HA 2 to HA 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-03-30 Amendment HA 2 to HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-30 Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-03-30 Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-30 Amendment HA 1 to HB 35 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-01-18 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 Favorable
2017-01-12 Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback