DE HB348 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill defines signature to include a digital or electronic signature, sets a date that parties can opt out of the Presidential Primary that is consistent with the new date of that election, eliminates obsolete language from the nomination process, brings the section dealing with assistance to voters in line with federal law, revises the date that citizens can first apply for an absentee ballot before a Presidential Primary, and permits the Departments of Elections to run absentee ballots through tabulators beginning the Friday before an election but prohibits them from extracting or reporting results before the polls have closed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-28 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-28 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2012-06-14 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2012-05-15 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |