DE HB346 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This Act establishes the High Needs Educator Student Loan Payment Program. The Program allows qualified applicants to apply for a payment from the State to the applicants lending agency, to pay a portion of the applicants student loan debt. The purpose of the Program is to encourage Educators to work and remain working in certification areas in which Delaware has a shortage and to encourage Educators to work and remain working in Delawares hardest-to-staff Schools. The amount of the award shall be no less than $1000 and no more than $2000. This substitute redesignates the chapter where this language will be placed in the code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-26 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-13 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2018-06-12 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NO 2 ABSENT
2018-06-12 Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-12 Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Defeated In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-04-26 Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-04-19 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 6 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2018-04-12 Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 346, and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback