DE HB345 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill increases the 1-time fee from $35 to $50 for Delawares environmental license plates in order to increase revenue to improve the capacity of the Delaware Center for the Inland Bays and The Partnership for the Delaware Estuary to fulfill their responsibilities to the protection and restoration of Delawares estuaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Registration Of Vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-04-18 Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
2018-04-17 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2018-03-15 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback