DE HB345 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill recognized American Sign Language as a World Language for purposes of school curriculum.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To School Curriculum And World Languages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-13 | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-04 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-04-21 | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 7 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |