DE HB344 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act modifies the existing Charter for the Municipal Services Commission for the City of New Castle.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Municipal Service Commission Of The City Of New Castle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |