DE HB343 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Joint Sunset Committee has existed since at least 1980 and, over time, it has become clear that the Committee's name does not accurately reflect all of the work that the Committee actually performs. The Committee has "sunsetted" an agency under review only twice in the history of the Committee’s existence: the Unemployment Appeals Board in 2003, which was reformed in 2005, and the Council on Manufactured Housing in 2015. Because "sunsetting" an agency is only one of the Committee’s many functions, the name "Joint Sunset Committee" has also grown confusing to the public. The Committee voted in 2016 at a public meeting to change its name to one that more accurately reflect the role it has in Delaware's General Assembly: the Joint Legislative Oversight and Sunset Committee. This Act is a result of the Committee's decision and makes changes to the Delaware Code to formalize this decision. It also makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the guidelines of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Joint Sunset Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |
2016-05-10 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 Unfavorable |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |