DE HB343 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act assures prosthetic parity for Delaware citizens who have experienced limb loss by requiring all individual and group health insurance policies provide orthotic and prosthetic devices at a reimbursement rate equal to the Federal reimbursement rate for the aged and disabled.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Health Insurance Contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-04-29 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2010-04-29 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2010-04-28 | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 8 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |