DE HB342 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act makes changes and adds clarifying language to the dealership licensing section of Title21. First, it allows for the suspension of a dealership license for violations of either Title 21 or Title 30 rather than the current requirement for violations of both titles. It also adds that a dealer whose license is suspended cannot reapply for a new license until the terms of the suspension have been met. It also ensures the same character and conviction review standards applied during initial application of a dealership license are also applied to the renewal process. Finally, this bill adds a basis for suspension when a dealership is approved in Delaware, but in reality is rarely present or merely has a virtual office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Sale Of Motor Vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-05-10 Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
2018-05-10 Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 4 ABSENT
2018-05-10 Amendment HA 1 to HB 342 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
2018-04-18 Amendment HA 1 to HB 342 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-28 Tabled in Committee
2018-03-20 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback