DE HB342 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
At the recommendation of the Joint Sunset Committee (“Committee”), this Act establishes the Department of Elections Voting Equipment Selection Task Force (“Task Force”). The current voting equipment used in Delaware will need to be replaced by 2018 or 2020. The State Elections Commissioner has started reviewing the numerous options available on the market and requested that the Committee form a task force with legislative representation so that the Commissioner may present 3 to 5 options for purchase or lease. The Task Force’s recommendation is advisory only.
Title
An Act Establishing A Department Of Elections Voting Equipment Selection Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-21 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Committee in Senate |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |
2016-05-10 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |