DE HB340 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill makes several updates and clarifications to the Interactive Fantasy Sports bill signed into law on July 26, 2017. The updates reflect the assignment of the regulation and tax administration to the Division of Gaming Enforcement and the Division of Revenue. This bill also allows for administrative expenses to be paid from the Interactive Fantasy Sports revenues. The bill requires persons who are in positions of control or authority of Interactive Fantasy Sports operators seeking to register in Delaware to submit to criminal background checks and provides for a basis for denial of an operators registration application if such individual has a criminal history. The bill also establishes administrative penalties for interactive Fantasy Sports operators who fail to comply with the law. Finally, this bill clarifies that season-long, friends and family games are exempt from licensing and enforcement requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 And Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Interactive Fantasy Sports Contests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10 Signed by Governor
2018-06-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-03-28 Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-03-27 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Gaming & Parimutuels) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-13 Introduced and Assigned to Gaming & Parimutuels Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback