DE HB34 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill expands the list of persons eligible to participate in the Ada Leigh Soles Memorial Professional Librarian and Archivist Incentive Scholarship Program to include employees of non-public libraries in Delaware that join the Delaware Library Consortium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Financial Assistance For Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-19 Signed by Governor
2017-04-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2017-03-28 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2017-03-28 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-03-15 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 13 On Its Merits
2017-01-12 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback