DE HB339 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill allows children under the age of 18 to be transferred to the Department of Corrections only after adjudication and an imposition of a sentence of incarceration. Currently, Delaware permits juveniles charged with adult offenses to be held in default of bail in the custody of the Department of Corrections. The trend nationwide is to hold juveniles charged with adult offenses in juvenile facilities pretrial as these facilities provide educational and rehabilitative programs.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Release Of Persons Accused Of Crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-05-03 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-18 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-03-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House |