DE HB339 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill amends the Delaware Code concerning barber licensing by permitting the merger of classroom instruction and an apprenticeship to attain licensure. Specifically, a combined 600 classroom instructional hours and 1500 apprenticeship hours will qualify the candidate for licensure barber licensure. This bill also inserts cosmetologist apprentice language in the appropriate subsection.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Related To Professional Licensing.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] | Rep. James Johnson [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Charles Potter [D] |
Rep. Daniel Short [R] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS and GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 4 Favorable |
2014-05-14 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis and Government Accountability) Committee in House |