DE HB336 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on October 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on October 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides school-base physical therapists who have graduated from an accredited college or university with the highest level masters or doctorate degree, and who have achieved a passing score on the national physical therapy examination issued by the Federation of State Boards of Physical Therapy, with base salaries of Master Plus 30 or Doctorate, and provides the ability to move forward on the salary schedule for additional credits earned. Since 2015, a doctorate degree is required in order to sit for the national physical therapy examination for licensure.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Basic Salary Schedule For School-based Physical Therapists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-15 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-07 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-07 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT | |
2022-04-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 5 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |