DE HB336 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act enhances the Family Court’s ability to protect victims of domestic violence and abuse by authorizing the Family Court to enter the no contact provisions of protection from abuse orders for up to 2 years in every case and, where aggravating circumstances exist, authorizing the Family Court to order no contact for as long as it deems necessary to prevent further abuse, including the entry of a permanent order.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Protection From Abuse Proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-05 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2010-03-25 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 5 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2010-03-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |