DE HB335 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 16 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act amends Delawares probate code by adding a new section to provide restricted access to a decedents safe deposit box located in a financial institution and held in the decedents sole name, for the limited purpose of retrieving the decedents last will and declaration of last remains.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 12 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Restricted Access To Safe Deposit Boxes For Retrieval Of Decedents Last Will And Declaration Of Last Remains.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-06-16 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2020-06-11 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2020-06-04 Suspension of Rules in House
2020-05-22 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback