DE HB335 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act establishes the Delaware School Safety and Security Fund to allow certain eligible public schools to partially or fully fund projects intended to improve school facilities and training relating to safety or security. The Department of Education shall administer the fund. This Act is effective upon appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Establishing A School Safety And Security Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-27 Rules Suspended in Senate
2018-06-26 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2018-06-21 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2018-06-21 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-06-21 Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-14 was introduced and adopted in lieu of HB 335

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback