DE HB330 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-9)
Status: Passed on October 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-9)
Status: Passed on October 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act renames the Claymont Regional Transportation at First State Crossing in Claymont, Delaware as the "Harris B. McDowell, III Transportation Center" after Senator Harris B. McDowell, III, the longest serving member of the Delaware General Assembly.
Title
An Act To Rename The Claymont Regional Transportation Center At First State Crossing In Honor Of Delaware State Senator Harris Brown Mcdowell, Iii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-14 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-03 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2022-05-03 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-04-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-04-05 | Re-Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2022-03-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |