DE HB329 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill is the result of recommendations made by the Joint Sunset Committee and makes changes to the Unemployment Insurance Appeal Board in terms of its composition, compensation and conduct which may warrant removal from the Board. The bill requires that the Board consist of 1 member from Sussex County, 1 from Kent County, 2 from New Castle County (with at least 1 from the City of Wilmington), and 1 at large member. The bill removes the provisions for members’ annual salaries and instead provides that the chairperson receive $200 for each meeting (not to exceed 80 meetings per year), and every other member receive $150 per meeting (not to exceed 80 meetings per year). The bill provides that a member will be considered to be in “neglect of duty” if they are absent without adequate reason for 3 consecutive meetings or fail to attend at least half of the meetings in one calendar year.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Unemployment Insurance Appeal Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-28 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-28 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2012-06-20 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-05-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |