DE HB327 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act is designed to address underage gambling offenses under § 4810 of Title 29 in a more efficient way.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Underage Gambling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-28 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-03-22 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 3 ABSENT
2018-03-22 Amendment HA 1 to HB 327 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-22 Amendment HA 1 to HB 327 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2018-03-01 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback