DE HB326 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act creates the Delaware Advance Scholarship Program (Program). The goal of this Act is to encourage Delaware students with intellectual disabilities to pursue studies for a comprehensive certificate or degree at a Delaware institution of higher education in order to promote economic self-sufficiency. This will result in an economic benefit to the State in the form of a more diverse, well-prepared workforce that is less reliant on government support. This Act follows the Higher Education Opportunities Act of 2008, which authorizes comprehensive transition and post-secondary programs as a pathway to higher education for students with intellectual disabilities. The Program will be effective beginning in the 2018 through 2019 academic year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Advance Scholarship Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2018-04-29 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2018-04-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-04-26 Amendment HA 2 to HB 326 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-04-26 Amendment HA 1 to HB 326 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-29 Amendment HA 2 to HB 326 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 13 On Its Merits
2018-03-28 Amendment HA 1 to HB 326 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-01 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback