DE HB324 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act requires that the Office of Child Care Licensing include application forms, the specific requirements to obtain a license, and due process provisions in regulations to ensure that child care providers have clear notice of what is required, the opportunity to comment on proposed changes, and an opportunity to correct minor deficiencies before they are posted on the Office of Child Care Licensings website as an instance of noncompliance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Child Care Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10 Signed by Governor
2018-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-04-29 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2018-04-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-04-26 Amendment HA 1 to HB 324 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2018-03-27 Amendment HA 1 to HB 324 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-01 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback