DE HB322 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill lowers the mayoral age requirement from 30 to 25. This change makes the Mayors age requirement consistent with that for City Councilmen. Under the City s Charter, if the Mayor resigns, dies or is unable to perform his/her duties, the Council President takes the Mayors place. This succession would prove problematic if the Council President does not meet the age requirement for Mayor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Wilmington Relating To Qualifications For Mayor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-04-25 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-04-24 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-01 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback