DE HB320 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
In 2000, the United States Federal Drug Administration ("FDA") first approved the Risk Evaluation and Mitigation Strategy ("REMS") for Mifeprex; and approved the generic version of Mifeprex, Mifepristone, in 2019. A regimen approved by the FDA in 2016 for Mifeprex and Mifepristone includes the use of Misoprostol. Under the REMS approved by the FDA, healthcare providers who wish to prescribe Mifepristone, Misoprostol, or Mifeprex must complete a Prescriber Agreement before ordering and dispensing the medication. Physicians assistants and advanced practiced registered nurses (APRNs) are healthcare providers who are eligible to prescribe these medications under the REMS. This bill allows physician assistants and advanced practice registered nurses to prescribe medication for the termination of pregnancy including Mifeprex, Mifepristone, and Misoprostol.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Relating To Prescribing Medications For The Termination Of Pregnancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-04-07 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 7 NO | |
2022-04-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 3 Favorable | |
2022-03-31 | Re-Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate | |
2022-03-24 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2022-03-24 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 15 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2022-03-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 5 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |