DE HB320 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill removes “homosexuality” and “lesbianism” from the definition of misconduct that may be used as grounds for a divorce.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Divorce And Annulment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-28HouseSigned by Governor
2016-06-09SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-05-18SenateReported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2016-05-10SenateAssigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
2016-05-10HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-05-04HouseReported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2016-04-13HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback