DE HB32 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Charter of the City of Lewes to allow the Mayor and City Council to exercise the powers given other municipalities as set out in the Municipal Tax Increment Financing Act and the Special Development District Act and to allow the Mayor and City Council to enter into certain contracts without competitive bidding in connection with municipal tax increment financing and special development districts. This Act also amends the Charter of the City of Lewes to increase the amount after which contracts must be publicly bid from $10,000 to $25,000.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Lewes, Chapter 170, Volume 57, Laws Of Delaware, As Amended, Entitled "an Act To Reincorporate The City Of Lewes", To Provide For Municipal Tax Increment Financing And To Provide For Municipal Special Development Districts, To Provide For An Exception To Competitive Bidding For Certain Contracts In Connection With Municipal Tax Increment Financing And Municipal Development Districts And To Increase The Contract Amount Not Subject To Competitive Bidding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-02 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-04-01 | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2009-03-24 | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2009-03-18 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2009-01-22 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |