DE HB317 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Amendment HA 1 to HB 317 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Amendment HA 1 to HB 317 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill is the Cover All Delaware Children Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Medical Coverage For All Delaware Children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 317 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-03-10 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2022-03-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-02-11 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |